ID H0030 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2019 Session Law Chapter 299 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

CRIMES -- Amends existing law to provide for the appointment or designation of an evaluation committee when a criminal defendant's alleged incompetency may be the result of a developmental disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for the appointment or designation of an evaluation committee when a criminal defendant's alleged incompetency may be the result of a developmental disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2019 Session Law Chapter 299 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-04-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 8:10 a.m. on April 3, 2019
2019-04-03HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-04-02SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-04-02SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-04-02HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-04-01Houseto enrol
2019-04-01HouseTitle apvd
2019-04-01HouseRead third time in full as amended in Senate -- PASSED 69-0-1
2019-03-29HouseRead second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-28HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-28HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2019-03-27HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2019-03-27HouseHouse Concurred in Senate Amendments
2019-03-27HouseReported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration for concurrence recommendation
2019-03-27HouseReturned from the Senate Amended
2019-03-26Senateto House
2019-03-26SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-26SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-03-20SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2019-03-19SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-19SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-03-19SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2019-03-19SenateAmendments ordered printed
2019-03-19SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-19SenateReferred to 14th Order for amendment
2019-03-18SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2019-01-29SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-01-28Houseto Senate
2019-01-28HouseTitle apvd
2019-01-28HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0
2019-01-25HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-01-24HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-21HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback