ID H0030 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 16, 2017 Session Law Chapter 15 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 16, 2017 Session Law Chapter 15 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTRIC UTILITIES -- Amends existing law to specify a market discount rate in determining the valuation of operating property of rate-regulated electric utility companies for assessment purposes.
Title
Amends existing law to specify a market discount rate in determining the valuation of operating property of rate-regulated electric utility companies for assessment purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 16, 2017 Session Law Chapter 15 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:10 a.m. on February 14, 2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-02-09 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-02-08 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-01-30 | House | to Senate |
2017-01-30 | House | Title apvd |
2017-01-30 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0 |
2017-01-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |