ID H0028 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-07 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-07 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE LOTTERY -- Amends existing law to provide that the state lottery may employ an electronic display for reporting a winning or losing lottery outcome when the displayed lottery outcome is associated with a printed lottery ticket presented by a player.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that the state lottery may employ an electronic display for reporting a winning or losing lottery outcome when the displayed lottery outcome is associated with a printed lottery ticket presented by a player.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2017-02-07 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 18-52-0 |
2017-02-06 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-02-03 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported out of Committee without Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |