ID H0024 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 170 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 170 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to water to delete the requirement that copies of notices be sent by ordinary mail to certain persons, to provide for notices that are accessible from the Internet homepage of the Department of Water Resources, to clarify that published notices are the official notices and to provide that any errors or omissions in notices displayed on the Internet homepage shall not invalidate the published notices.
Title
Amends existing law relating to water to delete the requirement that copies of notices be sent by ordinary mail to certain persons, to provide for notices that are accessible from the Internet homepage of the Department of Water Resources, to clarify that published notices are the official notices and to provide that any errors or omissions in notices displayed on the Internet homepage shall not invalidate the published notices.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 170 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-04 | Delivered to Governor on 04/01 | |
2011-04-01 | To Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-30 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-30 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-30 | To enrol | |
2011-03-29 | to House | |
2011-03-29 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-29 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-03-18 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-17 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-03 | to Res/Env | |
2011-03-03 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-03 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-02 | to Senate | |
2011-03-02 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-02 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 70-0-0 | |
2011-02-25 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-25 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-24 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-24 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-24 | Rpt out | |
2011-01-21 | to Res/Con | |
2011-01-21 | Rpt prt | |
2011-01-20 | to printing | |
2011-01-20 | 1st rdg | |
2011-01-20 | House intro |