ID H0023 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 16, 2017 Session Law Chapter 19 Effective: 02/16/2017 and shall apply to protests received on or after 02/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

TAXES -- Amends existing law to clarify a taxpayer's rights following a perfected protest and to provide a date on which a notice of deficiency becomes final when the protest is not perfected.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to clarify a taxpayer's rights following a perfected protest and to provide a date on which a notice of deficiency becomes final when the protest is not perfected.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-16HouseReported Signed by Governor on February 16, 2017 Session Law Chapter 19 Effective: 02/16/2017 and shall apply to protests received on or after 02/16/2017
2017-02-15HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:10 a.m. on February 14, 2017
2017-02-14HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2017-02-13SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2017-02-13SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2017-02-10HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2017-02-09HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2017-02-08Senateto House
2017-02-08SenateTitle apvd
2017-02-08SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2017-02-06SenateRetained on calendar
2017-02-03SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-02-02SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-01-27SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2017-01-27SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2017-01-26Houseto Senate
2017-01-26HouseTitle apvd
2017-01-26HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0
2017-01-25HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-01-24HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2017-01-20HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2017-01-19HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback