ID H0023 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 20, 2013 Session Law Chapter 10 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends existing law to remove language stating it is the State Tax Commission's duty to prescribe rules regarding reporting of the tax on beer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to remove language stating it is the State Tax Commission's duty to prescribe rules regarding reporting of the tax on beer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-20HouseReported Signed by Governor on February 20, 2013 Session Law Chapter 10 Effective: 07/01/13
2013-02-20HouseDelivered to Governor at 1:20 p.m. on February 19, 2013
2013-02-19HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2013-02-18SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2013-02-18SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2013-02-15HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2013-02-14HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2013-02-13Senateto House
2013-02-13SenateTitle apvd
2013-02-13SenatePASSED -- 32-0-3
2013-02-13SenateRead third time in full
2013-02-07SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2013-02-06SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2013-01-29SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2013-01-29SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2013-01-28Houseto Senate
2013-01-28HouseTitle apvd
2013-01-28HousePASSED -- 66-2-2
2013-01-28HouseRead Third Time in Full
2013-01-25HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, January 28, 2013
2013-01-24HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2013-01-23HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2013-01-18HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2013-01-17HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback