ID H0023 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - to Res/Env
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends existing law relating to drilling permits to revise fee provisions, to provide for the use of certain permit fees, to authorize the director of the Department of Water Resources to provide blanket drilling permits for closed loop heat exchange wells and to provide that the applications for blanket permits for site specific monitoring programs shall include specified design proposals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law relating to drilling permits to revise fee provisions, to provide for the use of certain permit fees, to authorize the director of the Department of Water Resources to provide blanket drilling permits for closed loop heat exchange wells and to provide that the applications for blanket permits for site specific monitoring programs shall include specified design proposals.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2011-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-03 to Res/Env
2011-03-03 1st rdg
2011-03-03 Senate intro
2011-03-02 to Senate
2011-03-02 Title apvd
2011-03-02 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 52-18-0
2011-02-25 to 3rd rdg
2011-02-25 2nd rdg
2011-02-24 to 2nd rdg
2011-02-24 rec d/p
2011-02-24 Rpt out
2011-01-21 to Res/Con
2011-01-21 Rpt prt
2011-01-20 to printing
2011-01-20 1st rdg
2011-01-20 House intro

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback