ID H0022 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

OCCUPATIONAL LICENSING -- Amends existing law regarding the Speech and Hearing Services Practice Act to provide that a licensee may show proof of licensure electronically and to remove the requirement that a sign language interpreter attain a minimum age to qualify for licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law regarding the Speech and Hearing Services Practice Act to provide that a licensee may show proof of licensure electronically and to remove the requirement that a sign language interpreter attain a minimum age to qualify for licensure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
2019-02-05SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-04Houseto Senate
2019-02-04HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-04HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0
2019-02-01HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-01-31HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-17HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback