ID H0021 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BUSINESSES OWNED BY MINORS -- Amends existing law to provide an exemption from local licensing and fee requirements for businesses owned and operated by persons under age 18 and to excuse them from paying sales and use tax in certain instances.
Title
Amends existing law to provide an exemption from local licensing and fee requirements for businesses owned and operated by persons under age 18 and to excuse them from paying sales and use tax in certain instances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-02-01 | House | to Senate |
2021-02-01 | House | Title apvd |
2021-02-01 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 68-2-0 |
2021-02-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-01-29 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |