ID H0018 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 22, 2017 Session Law Chapter 29 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 22, 2017 Session Law Chapter 29 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MILITARY DIVISION -- Amends existing law to provide that the adjutant general of the Idaho National Guard is authorized to encourage recruitment and retention of national guardsmen by providing incentive payments for furtherance of their education.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that the adjutant general of the Idaho National Guard is authorized to encourage recruitment and retention of national guardsmen by providing incentive payments for furtherance of their education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 22, 2017 Session Law Chapter 29 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on February 21, 2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-02-16 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-02-15 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-02-02 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-02 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-02 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2 |
2017-02-01 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |