ID H0016 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 11, 2019 Session Law Chapter 12 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

INCOME TAX -- Amends existing law to update terminology regarding employee withholding allowances and withholding allowance certificates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to update terminology regarding employee withholding allowances and withholding allowance certificates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HouseReported Signed by Governor on February 11, 2019 Session Law Chapter 12 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2019
2019-02-12HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:05 a.m. on February 11, 2019
2019-02-11HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-02-08SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-02-08SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-02-07HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-02-06HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-02-05Senateto House
2019-02-05SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-05SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-01-31SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-01-30SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2019-01-22SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-01-21Houseto Senate
2019-01-21HouseTitle apvd
2019-01-21HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 52-16-2
2019-01-18HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-01-17HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-15HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback