ID H0014 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Reported out of Committee and referred to: Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Reported out of Committee and referred to: Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR VEHICLES - Repeals existing law relating to labor and material liens on motor vehicles.
Title
Repeals existing law relating to labor and material liens on motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported out of Committee and referred to: Transportation |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-02-02 | House | to Senate |
2015-02-02 | House | Title apvd |
2015-02-02 | House | PASSED -- 50-19-1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-01-30 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 2, 2015 |
2015-01-29 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-01-28 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2015-01-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |