ID H0009 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 19, 2019 Session Law Chapter 26 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

BOARD OF MEDICINE -- Amends existing law to provide for physician assistants and to revise provisions regarding licensure, registration, discipline, disability, and board composition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for physician assistants and to revise provisions regarding licensure, registration, discipline, disability, and board composition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseReported Signed by Governor on February 19, 2019 Session Law Chapter 26 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-02-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:13 a.m. on February 18, 2019
2019-02-18HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-02-15SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-02-13HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-02-12Senateto House
2019-02-12SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-12SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-02-08SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-07SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
2019-01-31SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-01-30Houseto Senate
2019-01-30HouseTitle apvd
2019-01-30HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1
2019-01-29HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-01-28HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-15HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback