ID H0009 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 19, 2019 Session Law Chapter 26 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 19, 2019 Session Law Chapter 26 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BOARD OF MEDICINE -- Amends existing law to provide for physician assistants and to revise provisions regarding licensure, registration, discipline, disability, and board composition.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for physician assistants and to revise provisions regarding licensure, registration, discipline, disability, and board composition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 19, 2019 Session Law Chapter 26 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-02-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:13 a.m. on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-18 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-02-13 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2019-02-12 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-01-30 | House | to Senate |
2019-01-30 | House | Title apvd |
2019-01-30 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-01-28 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-01-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |