ID H0007 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

STATE TREASURER -- Amends existing law to provide that idle moneys may be invested in physical gold and silver in certain instances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that idle moneys may be invested in physical gold and silver in certain instances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2021-02-12SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2021-02-11Houseto Senate
2021-02-11HouseTitle apvd
2021-02-11HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 51-19-0
2021-02-11HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-02-10HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-02-09HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-01-20HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2021-01-19HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback