ID H0006 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2019 Session Law Chapter 78 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

OCCUPATIONAL LICENSING -- Amends existing law to define “licensed bachelor social worker” and to update terminology accordingly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to define “licensed bachelor social worker” and to update terminology accordingly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2019 Session Law Chapter 78 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-13HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:40 a.m. on March 12, 2019
2019-03-12HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-11SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-11SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-08HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-07HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-06Senateto House
2019-03-06SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-06SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-02-27SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-26SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
2019-01-29SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-01-28Houseto Senate
2019-01-28HouseTitle apvd
2019-01-28HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-1-0
2019-01-25HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, January 28, 2019
2019-01-24HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-01-23HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-15HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback