ID H0005 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Read second time; filed for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

TRANSPORTATION -- Amends existing law to provide for hands-free use of certain devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for hands-free use of certain devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2021-02-18SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-02-01SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
2021-02-01SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2021-01-29Houseto Senate
2021-01-29HouseTitle apvd
2021-01-29HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 39-28-3
2021-01-29HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-01-28HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-01-27HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-01-20HouseReported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
2021-01-19HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback