ID H0005 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 16, 2017 Session Law Chapter 22 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CONTROLLED SUBSTANCES -- Amends existing law to provide that opioid antagonists dispensed to humans shall be filed with the Board of Pharmacy, to provide that the board shall retain certain information for five years, to provide that pharmacists must register to access the controlled substances prescriptions database, and to revise a definition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that opioid antagonists dispensed to humans shall be filed with the Board of Pharmacy, to provide that the board shall retain certain information for five years, to provide that pharmacists must register to access the controlled substances prescriptions database, and to revise a definition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-16HouseReported Signed by Governor on February 16, 2017 Session Law Chapter 22 Effective: 07/01/2017
2017-02-14HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on February 13, 2017
2017-02-13HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2017-02-10SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2017-02-10SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2017-02-09HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2017-02-07HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2017-02-06Senateto House
2017-02-06SenateTitle apvd
2017-02-06SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2
2017-02-03SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-02-02SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
2017-01-31SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2017-01-30Houseto Senate
2017-01-30HouseTitle apvd
2017-01-30HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0
2017-01-27HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-01-26HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2017-01-17HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback