ID H0002 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 12, 2013 Session Law Chapter 2 Effective: 01/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 12, 2013 Session Law Chapter 2 Effective: 01/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to and amends existing law to allow a deduction for certain recovery amounts included in federal income if no benefit was previously allowed for Idaho income tax purposes.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law to allow a deduction for certain recovery amounts included in federal income if no benefit was previously allowed for Idaho income tax purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 12, 2013 Session Law Chapter 2 Effective: 01/01/13 |
2013-02-11 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:30 a.m. on February 8, 2013 |
2013-02-08 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-02-05 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-02-04 | Senate | to House |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-02-04 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-01-24 | House | to Senate |
2013-01-24 | House | Title apvd |
2013-01-24 | House | PASSED -- 65-1-4 |
2013-01-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-01-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2013-01-16 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |