ID H0001 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 13, 2019 Session Law Chapter 16 Effective: 02/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

WATER -- Adds to existing law to provide that the director of the Department of Water Resources shall subordinate permits and licenses for certain projects issued after a specified date to the capture and retention of water in existing on-stream storage reservoirs during and following flood control operations until the date of allocation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide that the director of the Department of Water Resources shall subordinate permits and licenses for certain projects issued after a specified date to the capture and retention of water in existing on-stream storage reservoirs during and following flood control operations until the date of allocation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseReported Signed by Governor on February 13, 2019 Session Law Chapter 16 Effective: 02/13/2019
2019-02-12HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:05 a.m. on February 11, 2019
2019-02-11HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-02-08SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-02-08SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-02-07HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-02-06HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-02-05Senateto House
2019-02-05SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-05SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-02-01SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-01-31SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
2019-01-23SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-01-22Houseto Senate
2019-01-22HouseTitle apvd
2019-01-22HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3
2019-01-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-01-18HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-09HouseReported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback