ID H0001 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on May 19, 2015 Session Law Chapter 1 Effective: 05/19/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HEALTH AND WELFARE - Amends and adds to existing law relating to the Uniform Interstate Family Support Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law relating to the Uniform Interstate Family Support Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-19HouseReported Signed by Governor on May 19, 2015 Session Law Chapter 1 Effective: 05/19/2015
2015-05-18HouseDelivered to Governor at 1 p.m. on May 19, 2015
2015-05-18HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2015-05-18SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2015-05-18SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2015-05-18HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2015-05-18HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2015-05-18Senateto House
2015-05-18SenateTitle apvd
2015-05-18SenateBurgoyne
2015-05-18Senate33-2-0 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Cameron, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- Nuxoll, Regan(Vick) Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor
2015-05-18SenatePASSED
2015-05-18SenateRead in full as required)
2015-05-18SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2015-05-18SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2015-05-18SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2015-05-18SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2015-05-18Houseto Senate
2015-05-18HouseTitle apvd
2015-05-18HouseWills & Luker
2015-05-18House49-21-0 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Bateman, Bell, Beyeler, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Chew, Clow(Stone), Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt(DeMordaunt), Erpelding, Gannon(King), Gibbs, Hartgen, Hixon, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, Nye, Packer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Andrus, Barbieri, Batt, Boyle, Cheatham, Dixon, Gestrin, Harris, Holtzclaw, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Palmer, Redman, Scott, Shepherd, Sims Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsors
2015-05-18HousePASSED
2015-05-18HouseRules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times
2015-05-18HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2015-05-18HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration
2015-05-18HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback