ID H0001 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 4, 2013 Session Law Chapter 1 Effective: 01/01/13 with stipulation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 4, 2013 Session Law Chapter 1 Effective: 01/01/13 with stipulation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to update references to the Internal Revenue Code.
Title
Amends existing law to update references to the Internal Revenue Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 4, 2013 Session Law Chapter 1 Effective: 01/01/13 with stipulation |
2013-02-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:40 a.m. on February 1, 2013 |
2013-02-01 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-01-30 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-01-29 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-01-28 | Senate | to House |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-01-28 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-01-17 | House | to Senate |
2013-01-17 | House | Title apvd |
2013-01-17 | House | Raybould |
2013-01-17 | House | 67-0-3 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Luker, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Packer, Palmer, Patterson, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rusche, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Ward-Engelking, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Loertscher, Malek, Nielsen Floor Sponsor |
2013-01-17 | House | PASSED |
2013-01-17 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 66 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 4, read three times |
2013-01-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-01-15 | House | Bill Previously Held at Desk, Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2013-01-14 | House | Reported Printed and Held at Desk |
2013-01-11 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |