IA SSB3188 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2350
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2350.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2350.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for regulation by employers and other entities of the use of marijuana and derivatives thereof.
Title
A bill for an act providing for regulation by employers and other entities of the use of marijuana and derivatives thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2350. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2020 8:00AM RM G17. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Bolkcom, and Breitbach. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SF2350 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 372.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3188 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3188.html |