IA SSB3173 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2432
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2380
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2380
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2380.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2380.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the manufacture, sale, and consumption of certain products containing hemp, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the manufacture, sale, and consumption of certain products containing hemp, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2380. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2020 12:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Kinney, and Sinclair. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HF2432 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 290.
SF2380 (Replaced by) 2020-06-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 700.
SF2380 (Replaced by) 2020-06-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 700.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3173 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3173.html |