IA SSB3156 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act exempting the storage of household goods and mini-storage from the sales tax on services.
Title
A bill for an act exempting the storage of household goods and mini-storage from the sales tax on services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/16/2022 12:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Taylor, J., Dawson, and Taylor, T. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
HSB716 (Related) 2022-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3156 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3156.html |