IA SSB3152 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2371
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2371.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2371.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to open feedlot operations, by providing for the validity of nutrient management plans and updates when classified as pending further action, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 2371.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to open feedlot operations, by providing for the validity of nutrient management plans and updates when classified as pending further action, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 2371.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2371. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2024 12:00PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Bennett, and Green. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON NATURAL RESOURCES AND ENVIRONMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB607 (Related) 2024-01-25 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2024 8:00AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber (Cancelled).
SF2371 (Replaced by) 2024-02-15 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 316.
SF2371 (Replaced by) 2024-02-15 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 316.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3152 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3152.html |