IA SSB3147 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2371
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2552
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2552
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2371.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2371.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state and local finances and the duties and procedures of the department of revenue by providing for electronic filing, communications, and records, modifying transfer tax remittances, the assessment of property, the collection of debt, and the taxation of pass-through entities, reducing inheritance taxes for unknown heirs, establishing salaries, providing for a fee, making appropriations, and providing penalties, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions.(See SF 2371.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to state and local finances and the duties and procedures of the department of revenue by providing for electronic filing, communications, and records, modifying transfer tax remittances, the assessment of property, the collection of debt, and the taxation of pass-through entities, reducing inheritance taxes for unknown heirs, establishing salaries, providing for a fee, making appropriations, and providing penalties, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions.(See SF 2371.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2371. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2022 8:00AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Petersen. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
HSB724 (Related) 2022-03-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2552.
SF2371 (Replaced by) 2022-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 579.
HF2552 (Replaced by) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 869.
SF2371 (Replaced by) 2022-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 579.
HF2552 (Replaced by) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 869.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3147 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3147.html |