IA SSB3142 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2392
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2392.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2392.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the operation of state government, including the review and sunset of state boards and agencies, the regulation of professions and occupations, and investigations conducted by state boards, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the operation of state government, including the review and sunset of state boards and agencies, the regulation of professions and occupations, and investigations conducted by state boards, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2392. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 3:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Smith, R., Chapman, and Jochum. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF2392 (Replaced by) 2020-03-11 - Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bloomingdale and Mascher. H.J. 588.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3142 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3142.html |