IA SSB3135 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2358
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2358.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2358.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to insurance coverage for supplemental and diagnostic breast examinations.(See SF 2358.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to insurance coverage for supplemental and diagnostic breast examinations.(See SF 2358.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2358. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2024 12:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee: Westrich, Koelker, and Petersen. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SF2358 (Replaced by) 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 684.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3135 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3135.html |