IA SSB3118 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2214
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to horse racing regulated by the racing and gaming commission.
Title
A bill for an act relating to horse racing regulated by the racing and gaming commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2018 3:30PM RM 315 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Brown, and Bisignano. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF2214 (Replaced by) 2018-03-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 764.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3118 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3118.html |