IA SSB3115 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2324
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2324.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2324.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the designation of real estate teams and the display of real estate licenses.(See SF 2324.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the designation of real estate teams and the display of real estate licenses.(See SF 2324.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2324. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2022 2:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee: Smith, R., Dawson, and Giddens. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF2324 (Replaced by) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 837.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3115 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3115.html |