IA SSB3110 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2248
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - Voted - Transportation.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - Voted - Transportation.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the department of transportation, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the department of transportation, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | Senate | Voted - Transportation. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | 11:00AM; Library Conference Room Transportation. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Transportation: Bowman Chair,Danielson, and Kapucian. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | In Transportation |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HSB632 (Related) 2016-02-16 - In Transportation
SF2248 (Replaced by) 2016-03-10 - Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 450.
SF2248 (Replaced by) 2016-03-10 - Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 450.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB3110 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB3110.html |