IA SSB3104 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2239
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act establishing a criminal penalty for violent repeat offenders and reducing earned time for offenders required to participate in batterers' education under certain circumstances.
Title
A study bill for an act establishing a criminal penalty for violent repeat offenders and reducing earned time for offenders required to participate in batterers' education under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | Senate | Voted - Judiciary. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | 4:00PM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Judiciary. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Judiciary: Sodders Chair,Petersen, and Schneider. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | In Judiciary |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SF2239 (Replaced by) 2016-03-09 - Fiscal note. SCS.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB3104 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB3104.html |