IA SSB3100 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2263
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to clerks of court, including the collection of court debt, the filing of medical reports, and the indexing of notices of lis pendens by county recorders, out=of=state=witness mileage expenses, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to clerks of court, including the collection of court debt, the filing of medical reports, and the indexing of notices of lis pendens by county recorders, out=of=state=witness mileage expenses, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Voted - Judiciary. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | 3:00PM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Judiciary. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Judiciary: Sodders Chair,Bisignano, and Whitver. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | In Judiciary |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SF2263 (Replaced by) 2016-03-08 - Subcommittee, Rogers, Baltimore, and Wolfe. H.J. 436.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB3100 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB3100.html |