IA SSB3094 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2280
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2308
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2308
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Voted - Economic Growth.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Voted - Economic Growth.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to economic development by establishing an enhance Iowa board to assume the powers and duties of the vision Iowa board and additional powers and duties, establishing an enhance Iowa fund, establishing a sports tourism program and fund, making appropriations, and including transition provisions.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to economic development by establishing an enhance Iowa board to assume the powers and duties of the vision Iowa board and additional powers and duties, establishing an enhance Iowa fund, establishing a sports tourism program and fund, making appropriations, and including transition provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Voted - Economic Growth. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | 8:00AM; RM 22 Economic Growth. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Economic Growth: Dotzler Chair,Anderson, and Bowman. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | In Economic Growth |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HSB634 (Related) 2016-02-17 - 8:00AM; House Lounge Economic Growth.
SF2280 (Replaced by) 2016-03-09 - Returned to Committee. S.J. 0.
SF2308 (Replaced by) 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
SF2280 (Replaced by) 2016-03-09 - Returned to Committee. S.J. 0.
SF2308 (Replaced by) 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB3094 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB3094.html |