IA SSB3091 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2202
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2202.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2202.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act repealing the Missouri river preservation and land use authority, and including transition provisions.
Title
A bill for an act repealing the Missouri river preservation and land use authority, and including transition provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2202. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2020 10:30AM RM 315. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Cournoyer, and Giddens. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF2202 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 263.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3091 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3091.html |