IA SSB3088 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2287
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2287.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2287.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to scrap metal transactions, including by regulating the sale of catalytic converters to scrap metal dealers and providing for recordkeeping requirements, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(See SF 2287.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to scrap metal transactions, including by regulating the sale of catalytic converters to scrap metal dealers and providing for recordkeeping requirements, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(See SF 2287.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2287. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2022 8:30AM Room G17. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Koelker, and Lykam. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SF2287 (Replaced by) 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 938.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3088 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3088.html |