IA SSB3075 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2279
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2300
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2300
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2300.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2300.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to public utilities, including energy production, public utility affiliates, and cable and video service.(See SF 2300.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to public utilities, including energy production, public utility affiliates, and cable and video service.(See SF 2300.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2300. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2024 1:30PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Klimesh, Brown, and Wahls. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB555 (Related) 2024-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2279.
HF2279 (Replaced by) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 936.
SF2300 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 942.
HF2279 (Replaced by) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 936.
SF2300 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 942.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3075 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3075.html |