IA SSB3075 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2288
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2288.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2288.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act pertaining to immunity from civil or criminal liability for acts of corporal punishment in schools.
Title
A bill for an act pertaining to immunity from civil or criminal liability for acts of corporal punishment in schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2288. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2020 3:45PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Hogg, and Nunn. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SF2288 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Amendment S-5040 filed. S.J. 485.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3075 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3075.html |