IA SSB3061 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2020 1:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2020 1:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the compensation of the executive director of the ethics and campaign disclosure board.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the compensation of the executive director of the ethics and campaign disclosure board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2020 1:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Smith, R., Bisignano, and Chapman. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB621 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3061 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3061.html |