IA SSB3048 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2153
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2366
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2366
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2366.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2366.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the college student aid commission's reporting requirements.(See SF 2366.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the college student aid commission's reporting requirements.(See SF 2366.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2366. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2024 11:00AM Room 315. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Taylor, J., Garrett, and Quirmbach. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB563 (Related) 2024-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2153.
HF2153 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
SF2366 (Replaced by) 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 685.
HF2153 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
SF2366 (Replaced by) 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 685.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3048 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3048.html |