IA SSB3036 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2261
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2435
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2435
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2261.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2261.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle registration fees for disabled veterans.(See SF 2261.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle registration fees for disabled veterans.(See SF 2261.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2261. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2022 11:30AM Room G17. |
2022-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Green, Giddens, and Lofgren. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON VETERANS AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
HSB643 (Related) 2022-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2433.
SF2261 (Replaced by) 2022-02-16 - Subcommittee: Goodwin, Dawson, and Dotzler. S.J. 304.
HF2435 (Replaced by) 2022-02-16 - Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 279.
SF2261 (Replaced by) 2022-02-16 - Subcommittee: Goodwin, Dawson, and Dotzler. S.J. 304.
HF2435 (Replaced by) 2022-02-16 - Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 279.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3036 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3036.html |