IA SSB3032 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2325.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2325.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act related to matters under the purview of the economic development authority including the high quality jobs program, the Iowa energy center, and the workforce housing tax incentive program.(See SF 2325.)
Title
A bill for an act related to matters under the purview of the economic development authority including the high quality jobs program, the Iowa energy center, and the workforce housing tax incentive program.(See SF 2325.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2325. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2022 3:30PM Room G15. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Koelker, Goodwin, and Mathis. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB540 (Related) 2022-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2292.
HF2292 (Replaced by) 2022-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 489.
SF2325 (Replaced by) 2022-06-22 - Fiscal note.
HF2519 (Replaced by) 2022-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 489.
HF2292 (Replaced by) 2022-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 489.
SF2325 (Replaced by) 2022-06-22 - Fiscal note.
HF2519 (Replaced by) 2022-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 489.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3032 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3032.html |