IA SSB3007 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2191.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2191.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to authorized uses of interest earned on funds in the flood recovery fund and including effective date provisions.(See SF 2191.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to authorized uses of interest earned on funds in the flood recovery fund and including effective date provisions.(See SF 2191.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2191. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2022 3:30PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Celsi, and Reichman. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB572 (Related) 2022-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2138.
HF2138 (Replaced by) 2022-03-30 - Withdrawn. H.J. 750.
SF2191 (Replaced by) 2022-04-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 768.
HF2515 (Replaced by) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 869.
HF2138 (Replaced by) 2022-03-30 - Withdrawn. H.J. 750.
SF2191 (Replaced by) 2022-04-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 768.
HF2515 (Replaced by) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 869.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3007 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3007.html |