IA SSB3006 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2088
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2169
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2169
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2088.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2088.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practices of pharmacy and nursing and the administration of immunizations and vaccinations, and the licensure of nonresident pharmacies.(See SF 2088.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practices of pharmacy and nursing and the administration of immunizations and vaccinations, and the licensure of nonresident pharmacies.(See SF 2088.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2088. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2022 11:30AM Room G17. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Reichman, Cournoyer, and Jochum. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB544 (Related) 2022-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2169.
SF2088 (Replaced by) 2022-05-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 918.
HF2169 (Replaced by) 2022-06-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 943.
SF2088 (Replaced by) 2022-05-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 918.
HF2169 (Replaced by) 2022-06-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 943.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3006 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3006.html |