IA SSB3005 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2228
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the licensure of genetic counselors, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and implementation provisions.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the licensure of genetic counselors, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and implementation provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/17/2018 12:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Subcommittee: Greene, Chapman, and Ragan. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SF2228 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 822.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3005 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3005.html |