IA SSB1272 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF357
Note: Legislation replaced by SF504
Note: Legislation replaced by SF504
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Voted - Ways and Means.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Voted - Ways and Means.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to revenue and taxation by increasing the sales and use tax rates, establishing transfers to the natural resources and outdoor recreation trust fund, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to revenue and taxation by increasing the sales and use tax rates, establishing transfers to the natural resources and outdoor recreation trust fund, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Voted - Ways and Means. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | 11:00AM; RM 22 Ways and Means. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Ways and Means: Hogg Chair,Behn, and Bolkcom. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | In Ways and Means |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SF357 (Replaced by) 2015-03-03 - Subcommittee, Johnson, Bolkcom, and Dearden. S.J. 429.
SF504 (Replaced by) 2016-04-13 - Subcommittee reassigned, Hogg, Behn, and Petersen. S.J. 690.
SF504 (Replaced by) 2016-04-13 - Subcommittee reassigned, Hogg, Behn, and Petersen. S.J. 690.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB1272 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB1272.html |