IA SSB1249 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF582
Note: Legislation replaced by HF856
Note: Legislation replaced by HF856
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 582.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 582.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning the rulemaking process for executive branch agencies and related matters.(See SF 582.)
Title
A bill for an act concerning the rulemaking process for executive branch agencies and related matters.(See SF 582.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 582. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/10/2021 3:30PM RM 24A. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Goodwin, and Jochum. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB270 (Related) 2021-04-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 856.
SF582 (Replaced by) 2021-06-22 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 1148.
HF856 (Replaced by) 2021-04-01 - Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 876.
SF582 (Replaced by) 2021-06-22 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 1148.
HF856 (Replaced by) 2021-04-01 - Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 876.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1249 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1249.html |