IA SSB1247 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/09/2021 3:30PM 217 Conference Room.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/09/2021 3:30PM 217 Conference Room.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to pandemic relief by excluding certain COVID-19 related grants from the individual and corporate income taxes, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to pandemic relief by excluding certain COVID-19 related grants from the individual and corporate income taxes, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/09/2021 3:30PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Petersen, and Smith, R. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1247 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1247.html |