IA SSB1244 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF200
Note: Legislation replaced by SF462
Note: Legislation replaced by SF462
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Human Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Human Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to the maintenance and administration of epinephrine in schools and certain other facilities.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to the maintenance and administration of epinephrine in schools and certain other facilities.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Senate | Voted - Human Resources. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | 3:00PM; Room 206 Human Resources. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Human Resources: Ragan Chair,Chelgren, and Dotzler. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | In Human Resources |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HF200 (Replaced by) 2015-04-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 784.
SF462 (Replaced by) 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 932.
SF462 (Replaced by) 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 932.